IA HSB513 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2157
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2273
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2273
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to elections administration with respect to the address confidentiality program, satellite absentee voting, and the conduct of school district elections.
Title
A study bill relating to elections administration with respect to the address confidentiality program, satellite absentee voting, and the conduct of school district elections.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Voted - State Government. |
2016-01-28 | House | 7:30AM; House Lounge State Government. |
2016-01-19 | House | State Government: Hein Chair,Cohoon, and Moore. |
2016-01-19 | House | In State Government |
2016-01-19 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3020 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Voted - State Government.
SF2157 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 698.
HF2273 (Replaced by) 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
SF2157 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 698.
HF2273 (Replaced by) 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB513 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB513.html |