IA HF2273 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to elections administration with respect to the address confidentiality program, the printing of ballots, satellite absentee voting, and the conduct of school district elections. (Formerly HSB 513)
Title
A bill for an act relating to elections administration with respect to the address confidentiality program, the printing of ballots, satellite absentee voting, and the conduct of school district elections. (Formerly HSB 513)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 755. |
2016-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 699. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 691. |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8205. H.J. 691. |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate amendment H-8205 filed. H.J. 653. |
2016-04-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 645. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 695. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 695. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5128 filed, adopted. S.J. 695. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5127 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 694. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2157. S.J. 694. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 470. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar Senate File 2157. S.J. 318. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 318. |
2016-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 283. |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 279. |
2016-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 222. |