IA HSB502 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2402
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Medicaid reimbursement rate for psychiatric medical institutions for children.(See HF 2402.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Medicaid reimbursement rate for psychiatric medical institutions for children.(See HF 2402.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2402. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 207. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/10/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-08 | House | Subcommittee: Wilz, H., Andrews and Brown-Powers. H.J. 10. |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 9. |
2024-01-08 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2402 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB502 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB502.html |