IA HSB225 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF628
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to Iowa's urban renewal law by modifying requirements for the annual report prepared by the legislative services agency, establishing restrictions on the use of divided revenues, modifying the methodology for calculating the amount of divided revenues, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to Iowa's urban renewal law by modifying requirements for the annual report prepared by the legislative services agency, establishing restrictions on the use of divided revenues, modifying the methodology for calculating the amount of divided revenues, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Voted - Ways and Means. |
2015-04-01 | House | 11:00AM; RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult Ways and Means. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ways and Means: Sands Chair,Byrnes, and Isenhart. |
2015-03-25 | House | In Ways and Means |
2015-03-25 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF628 (Replaced by) 2015-06-04 - Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1135.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB225 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB225.html |