IA HSB208 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF525
Note: Legislation replaced by HF681
Note: Legislation replaced by HF681
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act permitting qualified entities to request national criminal history checks of certain covered individuals.
Title
A bill for an act permitting qualified entities to request national criminal history checks of certain covered individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 4:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Salmon and Sunde. H.J. 363. |
2019-02-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1203 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF525 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1059.
HF681 (Replaced by) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
SF525 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1059.
HF681 (Replaced by) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB208 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB208.html |