IA HF681 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act permitting qualified entities to request national criminal history checks of certain covered individuals. (Formerly HSB 208.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act permitting qualified entities to request national criminal history checks of certain covered individuals. (Formerly HSB 208.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 949. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1060. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1059. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 525. S.J. 1059. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 525. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 100 nays none. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 478. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1203 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB208 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
SF525 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1059.
HSB208 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.
SF525 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1059.