IA HSB207 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF741
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 741.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 741.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the location and marking of underground facilities and providing penalties.(See HF 741.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the location and marking of underground facilities and providing penalties.(See HF 741.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 741. |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 563. |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Andrews and Jacoby. H.J. 395. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 393. |
2021-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1188 (Related) 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF741 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 965.
HF741 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB207 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB207.html |