IA SSB1188 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF741
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the location and marking of underground facilities and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the location and marking of underground facilities and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 4:30PM RM 111. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Brown, Goodwin, and Lykam. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Goodwin, and Wahls. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB207 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 741.
HF741 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 965.
HF741 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1188 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1188.html |