IA HSB207 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 420.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 420.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, by changing the name of the weather bureau, modifying reporting requirements regarding agricultural liming material, modifying provisions applicable to demonstration projects involving alternative fuels, transferring certain Code sections, providing for the use of certain appropriated moneys for surface water quality, and eliminating certain watershed demonstration pilot projects.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, by changing the name of the weather bureau, modifying reporting requirements regarding agricultural liming material, modifying provisions applicable to demonstration projects involving alternative fuels, transferring certain Code sections, providing for the use of certain appropriated moneys for surface water quality, and eliminating certain watershed demonstration pilot projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 420. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 11:45AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Mommsen and Bearinger. H.J. 363. |
2019-02-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1182 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF427 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614. S.J. 863.
HF640 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
HF750 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
SF614 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1057.
SF427 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614. S.J. 863.
HF640 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
HF750 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
SF614 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1057.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB207 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB207.html |