IA SF614 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1057.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1057.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, by changing the name of the weather bureau, modifying provisions applicable to demonstration projects involving alternative fuels, transferring certain Code sections, providing for the use of certain appropriated moneys for surface water quality, and eliminating certain watershed demonstration pilot projects. (Formerly SSB 1182, SF 427.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, by changing the name of the weather bureau, modifying provisions applicable to demonstration projects involving alternative fuels, transferring certain Code sections, providing for the use of certain appropriated moneys for surface water quality, and eliminating certain watershed demonstration pilot projects. (Formerly SSB 1182, SF 427.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1057. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | HF 750 substituted. S.J. 1056. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3202 filed, adopted. S.J. 1056. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 750. S.J. 985. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 863. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 861. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1182 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB207 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 420.
SF427 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614. S.J. 863.
HF640 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
HF750 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
HSB207 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 420.
SF427 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614. S.J. 863.
HF640 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
HF750 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF614 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF614.html |