IA HSB156 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF516

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 354.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for county sheriff voting membership on joint 911 service boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for county sheriff voting membership on joint 911 service boards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 354.
2019-02-22HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee: Thorup, Worthan and Thede. H.J. 260.
2019-02-12HouseBy COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY

Same As/Similar To

HF516 (Replaced by) 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback