IA HF516 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Message from Senate. H.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to voting membership on joint 911 service boards. (Formerly HSB 156.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to voting membership on joint 911 service boards. (Formerly HSB 156.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 901.
2019-04-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 992.
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 990.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931.
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 825.
2019-03-26SenateSubcommittee: Segebart, Lofgren, and J. Smith. S.J. 751.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 713.
2019-03-25SenateMessage from House. S.J. 713.
2019-03-21HouseImmediate message. H.J. 616.
2019-03-25HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 622.
2019-03-21HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 610.
2019-03-21HouseAmendment H-1068 adopted. H.J. 609.
2019-03-20HouseAmendment H-1068 filed. H.J. 601.
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 351.

Same As/Similar To

HSB156 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 354.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback