IA HSB121 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF434
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.(See HF 434.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.(See HF 434.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 12:30PM RM 19. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Lundgren and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 177. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 174. |
2021-01-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1157 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF434 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 964.
HF434 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 964.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB121 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB121.html |