IA SSB1157 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF434

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-02-15SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 1:00PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-02-03SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Lofgren, and Ragan.
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-02-03SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

HSB121 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
HF434 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 964.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback