IA HF434 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 964.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 964.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.(Formerly HSB 121.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.(Formerly HSB 121.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 964. |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendments H-1303 and H-1305 filed. H.J. 855. |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendments H-1128, H-1129 and H-1130 filed. H.J. 604. |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendments H-1125, H-1126 and H-1127 filed. H.J. 603. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 310. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB121 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
SSB1157 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SSB1157 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF434 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF434.html |