IA HSB119 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF327
Note: Legislation replaced by SF391
Note: Legislation replaced by SF391
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 327.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 327.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to comprehensive school improvement plans, teacher librarians and guidance counselors, required days or hours of instruction in elementary and secondary schools, agreements between school districts and community colleges to teach certain courses, required courses in school districts and accredited nonpublic schools, and shared operational functions, and authorizing school districts to offer sequential units in one classroom.(See HF 327.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to comprehensive school improvement plans, teacher librarians and guidance counselors, required days or hours of instruction in elementary and secondary schools, agreements between school districts and community colleges to teach certain courses, required courses in school districts and accredited nonpublic schools, and shared operational functions, and authorizing school districts to offer sequential units in one classroom.(See HF 327.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 327. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 309. |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-2. |
2023-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 11:00AM RM 304. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Johnson, Cahill, Gustoff, Ingels and Madison. H.J. 212. |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 211. |
2023-01-31 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1076 (Related) 2023-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 391.
HF327 (Replaced by) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
SF391 (Replaced by) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
HF327 (Replaced by) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
SF391 (Replaced by) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB119 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB119.html |