IA HSB107 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 254. |
2019-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Deyoe and Williams. H.J. 196. |
2019-01-31 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF355 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
SSB1174 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF509 (Replaced by) 2019-03-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF612 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Carlson and McConkey. H.J. 444.
SSB1174 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF509 (Replaced by) 2019-03-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF612 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Carlson and McConkey. H.J. 444.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB107.html |