IA SF509 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1174; See SF 612.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1174; See SF 612.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3018 filed. S.J. 570. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Bolkcom, and Nunn. S.J. 546. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 514. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 487. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 483. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB107 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 254.
HF355 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
SSB1174 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF612 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Carlson and McConkey. H.J. 444.
HF355 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
SSB1174 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF612 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Carlson and McConkey. H.J. 444.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF509 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF509.html |