IA HF848 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 796, HSB 133.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 796, HSB 133.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3135 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3135 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1031. |
2021-04-20 | House | NOBA: Final |
2021-04-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 897. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 760. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 756. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-3135 filed, lost. S.J. 755. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Substituted for SF 390. S.J. 755. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 390. S.J. 710. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 710. |
2021-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 858. |
2021-03-24 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 759. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB133 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 796.
SSB1089 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
SF390 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF796 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SSB1089 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
SF390 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF796 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.