IA SSB1089 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 390.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 390.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2021 3:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2021 2:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Lykam, Schultz, Wahls, and Williams. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 154. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB133 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 796.
SF390 (Replaced by) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF796 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HF848 (Replaced by) 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
SF390 (Replaced by) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF796 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HF848 (Replaced by) 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1089 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1089.html |