IA HF796 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 133; See HF 848.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 133; See HF 848.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 848. |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 757. |
2021-03-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 4-0 |
2021-03-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-03-09 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Hall, Thompson, Williams and Wills. H.J. 699. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 617. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB133 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 796.
SSB1089 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
SF390 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF848 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
SSB1089 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
SF390 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF848 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF796 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF796.html |