IA HSB133 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 796.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 796.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 796, HF 848.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to broadband service, including matters under the purview of the office of the chief information officer, the empower rural Iowa broadband grant fund, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 796, HF 848.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 796. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 600. |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Hite and Williams. H.J. 197. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Information Technology. H.J. 194. |
2021-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1089 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 390.
SF390 (Replaced by) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF796 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HF848 (Replaced by) 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
SF390 (Replaced by) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 757.
HF796 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HF848 (Replaced by) 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1032.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB133 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB133.html |