IA HF843 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 962.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 962.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to landlords and tenants, including service animal requirements, rent late fees, forcible entry and detainer property disposal, and peaceable possession, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 253; See HF 866.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to landlords and tenants, including service animal requirements, rent late fees, forcible entry and detainer property disposal, and peaceable possession, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 253; See HF 866.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 962. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 866. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 917. |
2021-03-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 1:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2021-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Osmundson and Wolfe. H.J. 777. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 743. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB253 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 866.
HF866 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF866 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF843 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF843.html |