IA HSB253 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF843
Note: Legislation replaced by HF866
Note: Legislation replaced by HF866
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to landlords and tenants, including service animal requirements, rent late fees, forcible entry and detainer property disposal, and peaceable possession, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 843, HF 866.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to landlords and tenants, including service animal requirements, rent late fees, forcible entry and detainer property disposal, and peaceable possession, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 843, HF 866.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 866. |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 614. |
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 7:30AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Wessel-Kroeschell and Westrich. H.J. 550. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 548. |
2021-02-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF843 (Replaced by) 2021-04-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 962.
HF866 (Replaced by) 2021-04-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF866 (Replaced by) 2021-04-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB253 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB253.html |