IA HF79 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the frequency of game nights conducted by licensed qualified organizations.(See HF 311.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the frequency of game nights conducted by licensed qualified organizations.(See HF 311.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 311. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 258. |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 4:30PM RM 19. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Cohoon and Jones. H.J. 175. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 109. |
Same As/Similar To
SF144 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 802.
HF311 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
HF311 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF79 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF79.html |