IA HF711 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 360, HSB 20.) Effective date: 01/01/2022. Applicability date: 01/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 360, HSB 20.) Effective date: 01/01/2022. Applicability date: 01/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210. |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-06-24 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-05-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1118. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1075. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 1074. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 896. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Whiting. S.J. 596. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 574. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 574. |
2021-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 661. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 656. |
2021-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 560. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1011 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 244.
HSB20 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
HF360 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF244 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB20 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
HF360 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF244 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.