IA HF360 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 20; See HF 711.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 20; See HF 711.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 679. |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 711. |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 558. |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 7:30AM House Lounge. |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Hite and Wolfe. H.J. 488. |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-04 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1011 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 244.
HSB20 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
SF244 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF711 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
HSB20 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
SF244 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF711 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.