IA HSB20 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 360, HF 711.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 360, HF 711.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 360. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285. |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/14/2021 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Lohse and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 72. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 69. |
2021-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1011 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 244.
HF360 (Replaced by) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF244 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF711 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
HF360 (Replaced by) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SF244 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF711 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB20 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB20.html |