IA SSB1011 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF360
Note: Legislation replaced by SF244

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 244.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 244.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate matters, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 244.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 244.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 2:00PM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Bolkcom, and Taylor, J.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB20 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
HF360 (Replaced by) 2021-02-25 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 558.
SF244 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback