IA HF648 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to sports gambling and wagering, by providing for fantasy sports contests and sports betting, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 198; See HF 748.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to sports gambling and wagering, by providing for fantasy sports contests and sports betting, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 198; See HF 748.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 945.
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 601.
2019-03-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-03-14HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2019 12:00PM RM 19.
2019-03-11HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Bossman, Forbes, Hein and Nielsen. H.J. 497.
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 415.

Same As/Similar To

HSB198 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 394.
HF748 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback