IA HF748 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to sports gambling and wagering, by providing for fantasy sports contests and sports betting, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 648 and HSB 198.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to sports gambling and wagering, by providing for fantasy sports contests and sports betting, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 648 and HSB 198.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 945.
2019-04-22HouseSF 617 substituted. H.J. 936.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1251 adopted. H.J. 936.
2019-04-18HouseAmendment H-1251 filed. H.J. 926.
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 620.

Same As/Similar To

HSB198 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 394.
HF648 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback