IA HF589 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the property tax levy for the payment of general obligation bonds issued by cities for certain flood-related purposes and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 99; See HF 741.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the property tax levy for the payment of general obligation bonds issued by cities for certain flood-related purposes and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 99; See HF 741.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 945. |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 551. |
2019-03-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2019 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bossman and Kurth. H.J. 401. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 388. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB99 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366.
HF741 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
HF741 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF589 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF589.html |