IA HF566 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to establish requirements relating to the transfer of an interest in real estate by or on behalf of certain entities formed or organized on a profit, cooperative, or not-for-profit basis, and including warranties and a limitation on actions. (Formerly HSB 208) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act to establish requirements relating to the transfer of an interest in real estate by or on behalf of certain entities formed or organized on a profit, cooperative, or not-for-profit basis, and including warranties and a limitation on actions. (Formerly HSB 208) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-05-15 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1060. |
2013-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1043. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1043. |
2013-05-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 990. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 957. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 956. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate receded. S.J. 956. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 944. |
2013-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 966. |
2013-04-30 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1304. H.J. 965. |
2013-04-16 | House | Senate amendment H-1304 filed. H.J. 860. |
2013-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 855. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 846. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 856. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3128 adopted. S.J. 845. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 827. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3128 filed. S.J. 740. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 740. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee, Taylor, Horn, and Schneider. S.J. 714. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 708. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 708. |
2013-04-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 728. |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 726. |
2013-04-02 | House | Amendment H-1238 adopted. H.J. 725. |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1238 filed. H.J. 724. |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 546. |