IA HF546 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school funding by modifying provisions relating to the collection of sales tax for deposit in the secure an advanced vision for education fund, provisions relating to the use of tax revenue from the secure an advanced vision for education fund, and provisions relating to the calculation of the additional property tax levy, and making appropriations. (Formerly HF 425.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to school funding by modifying provisions relating to the collection of sales tax for deposit in the secure an advanced vision for education fund, provisions relating to the use of tax revenue from the secure an advanced vision for education fund, and provisions relating to the calculation of the additional property tax levy, and making appropriations. (Formerly HF 425.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1137. |
2019-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 95 nays 4. H.J. 1027. |
2019-04-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1306. H.J. 1027. |
2019-04-24 | House | Senate amendment H-1306 filed. H.J. 1014. |
2019-04-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1003. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1110. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 2. S.J. 1108. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3180 adopted. S.J. 1108. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1071. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3180 filed. S.J. 1012. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 1012. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Quirmbach, and R. Smith. S.J. 751. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 675. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 622. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 622. |
2019-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 549. |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 3. H.J. 540. |
2019-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1024 withdrawn. H.J. 540. |
2019-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1022 adopted. H.J. 540. |
2019-03-12 | House | Amendments H-1022 and H-1024 filed. H.J. 526. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 369. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB18 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 290.
HF425 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.
HF425 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.