IA HF425 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school funding by modifying provisions relating to the collection of sales tax for deposit in the secure an advanced vision for education fund, provisions relating to the use of tax revenue from the secure an advanced vision for education fund, and provisions relating to the calculation of the additional property tax levy, and making appropriations. (Formerly HSB 18; See HF 546.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to school funding by modifying provisions relating to the collection of sales tax for deposit in the secure an advanced vision for education fund, provisions relating to the use of tax revenue from the secure an advanced vision for education fund, and provisions relating to the calculation of the additional property tax levy, and making appropriations. (Formerly HSB 18; See HF 546.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 549. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 367. |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 11:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Isenhart and Osmundson. H.J. 307. |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB18 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 290.
HF546 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
HF546 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF425 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF425.html |