IA HF523 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing medical examiners access to information in the drug prescribing and dispensing information program. (Formerly HF 332.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act providing medical examiners access to information in the drug prescribing and dispensing information program. (Formerly HF 332.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1000. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1014. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 1012. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 802. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Kinney, and Schultz. S.J. 687. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 666. |
2017-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 657. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 514. |
Same As/Similar To
HF332 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 665.