IA HF488 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to health-related data including hospital data and certain information included in reportable disease reports.(Formerly HSB 141.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to health-related data including hospital data and certain information included in reportable disease reports.(Formerly HSB 141.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 669.
2021-02-24SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-02-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-02-23SenateSubcommittee: Carlin, Garrett, and Ragan. S.J. 446.
2021-02-18SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 398.
2021-02-18SenateMessage from House. S.J. 398.
2021-02-17HouseImmediate message. H.J. 466.
2021-02-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 546.
2021-02-17HousePassed House, yeas 96 nays none. H.J. 452.
2021-02-17HousePoint of order raised on H-1061, ruled not germane. H.J. 451.
2021-02-16HouseAmendment H-1061 filed. H.J. 441.
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 376.

Same As/Similar To

HSB141 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback