IA HSB141 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF488
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to personally identifiable information included in reportable disease reports.(See HF 488.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to personally identifiable information included in reportable disease reports.(See HF 488.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334. |
2021-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 8:00AM House Lounge #1. |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Fry and Mascher. H.J. 197. |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 195. |
2021-01-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF488 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 622.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB141 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB141.html |