IA HF449 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 923.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 923.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mental health crisis facilities. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mental health crisis facilities. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 923. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 883. |
2015-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 862. |
2015-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 92, nays none. H.J. 861. |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1214. H.J. 861. |
2015-04-09 | House | Senate amendment H-1214 filed. H.J. 816. |
2015-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 810. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 829. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 825. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3101 as amended, adopted. S.J. 825. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3104 adopted. S.J. 825. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3104 filed. S.J. 807. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Amendment S-3101 filed. S.J. 786. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 786. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee, Ragan, Johnson, and Wilhelm. S.J. 596. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 594. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 594. |
2015-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 573. |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 560. |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1032 adopted. H.J. 559. |
2015-03-10 | House | Amendment H-1032 filed. H.J. 537. |
2015-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 440. |