IA HF332 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of alternative and complementary medicine, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of alternative and complementary medicine, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Shipley [R] | Rep. Anne Osmundson [R] | Rep. Terry Baxter [R] | Rep. Skyler Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Bobby Kaufmann [R] | Rep. Phil Thompson [R] | Rep. Ray Sorensen [R] | Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] |
Rep. Jon Jacobsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Anderson and Dolecheck. H.J. 313. |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 244. |
Same As/Similar To
SF261 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 10:30AM RM 315.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF332 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF332.html |