IA SF261 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 10:30AM RM 315.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the practice of alternative and complementary medicine, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the practice of alternative and complementary medicine, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 10:30AM RM 315.
2019-02-13SenateSubcommittee: Greene, Carlin, and Ragan. S.J. 311.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 299.

Same As/Similar To

HF332 (Similar To) 2019-02-19 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 8:30AM House Lounge.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback