IA HF323 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 981.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 981.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the exploitation of a dependent adult by a caretaker. (Formerly HSB 21.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the exploitation of a dependent adult by a caretaker. (Formerly HSB 21.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 981. |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 946. |
2019-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 809. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 921. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 918. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Substituted for SF 153. S.J. 917. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 153. S.J. 370. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 370. |
2019-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 329. |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 239. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1015 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB21 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
SF153 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.
HSB21 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
SF153 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.