IA HF304 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reports of personal degradation by caretakers of dependent adults in facilities and programs regulated by the department of inspections and appeals. (Formerly HSB 74.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reports of personal degradation by caretakers of dependent adults in facilities and programs regulated by the department of inspections and appeals. (Formerly HSB 74.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 904. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1015. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1014. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 752. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Costello, and Mathis. S.J. 675. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 641. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 641. |
2019-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 561. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 554. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 226. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB74 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.