IA HF2654 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/10/2024 11:00AM Senate Lounge.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/10/2024 11:00AM Senate Lounge.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tax collections for buildings or improvements erected or made by a person on land owned by another person.(Formerly HF 2566, HSB 685.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tax collections for buildings or improvements erected or made by a person on land owned by another person.(Formerly HF 2566, HSB 685.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/10/2024 11:00AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rowley, Driscoll, and Quirmbach. S.J. 741. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 722. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 722. |
2024-04-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 713. |
2024-04-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 737. |
2024-04-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 713. |
2024-04-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 704. |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 542. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2124 (Similar To) 2024-02-06 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 227.
HSB685 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2566.
HF2566 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.
HSB685 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2566.
HF2566 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 713.