IA HF2625 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 561.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 561.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sales tax imposed on amusement devices.(Formerly HF 276, HSB 60.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sales tax imposed on amusement devices.(Formerly HF 276, HSB 60.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 561. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 513. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 513. |
2024-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 565. |
2024-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 74, nays 25. H.J. 564. |
2024-02-27 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 365. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB60 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 276.
HF276 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HF276 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.