IA HF2460 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 795. |
2016-04-29 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 827. |
2016-04-29 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 19. S.J. 826. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 826. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 825. |
2016-04-29 | House | Message from House. S.J. 825. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 791. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 51, nays 41. H.J. 791. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 790. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 790. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 785. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 750. |
2016-04-25 | House | House conference committee appointed Heaton, L. Miller, Fry, Wessel-Kroeschell, and Heddens. H.J. 747. |
2016-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 747. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 781. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Ragan, Bolkcom, Costello, Dvorsky, and Johnson. S.J. 781. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate insisted. S.J. 780. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 780. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 742. |
2016-04-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 751. |
2016-04-25 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-8277. H.J. 733. |
2016-04-25 | House | Senate amendment H-8277. H.J. 732. |
2016-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 729. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 775. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 776. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 23. S.J. 774. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 as amended, adopted. S.J. 774. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5166 filed, adopted. S.J. 774. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5164 filed, adopted. S.J. 774. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5172 filed, lost. S.J. 773. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 filed. S.J. 760. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 760. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Subcommittee, Ragan, Dvorsky, and Segebart. S.J. 752. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 746. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 746. |
2016-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 689. |
2016-04-20 | House | Chief Clerk's report on correction in engrossment H.J. 700. |
2016-04-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 700. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 42. H.J. 689. |
2016-04-19 | House | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 685. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8231 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 684. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8229 lost. H.J. 684. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8229 filed. H.J. 683. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8226 lost. H.J. 683. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8251 filed, adopted. H.J. 682. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendments H-8232 and H-8240 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 682. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8249 adopted. H.J. 682. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8249 filed. H.J. 681. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8243 lost. H.J. 681. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8243 filed. H.J. 680. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendments H-8234 and H-8228 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 680. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8247 lost. H.J. 680. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8247 filed. H.J. 679. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8239 filed, adopted. H.J. 679. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8223 adopted. H.J. 679. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8230 to amendment H-8223 lost. H.J. 679. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8230 to amendment H-8223 filed. H.J. 678. |
2016-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8219 withdrawn. H.J. 678. |
2016-04-18 | House | Amendments H-8223 and H-8226 filed. H.J. 666. |
2016-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8219 filed. H.J. 665. |
2016-04-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 651. |