IA HF2455 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing the use of a leashed dog to track and retrieve a wounded deer and providing a penalty. (Formerly HF 657, HF 363.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act allowing the use of a leashed dog to track and retrieve a wounded deer and providing a penalty. (Formerly HF 657, HF 363.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 791. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 791. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 686. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 746. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 746. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5119 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 746. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 683. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Kapucian, and Lykam. S.J. 538. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 524. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 524. |
2020-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 461. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 2. H.J. 459. |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8060 adopted. H.J. 459. |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8060 filed. H.J. 447. |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 305. |
Same As/Similar To
HF363 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
HF657 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
HF657 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.