IA HF657 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing the use of a leashed dog to track and retrieve a wounded deer and providing a penalty. (Formerly HF 363; See HF 2455.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing the use of a leashed dog to track and retrieve a wounded deer and providing a penalty. (Formerly HF 363; See HF 2455.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 484. |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 299. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Bearinger and Thorup. H.J. 161. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 755. |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 472. |
Same As/Similar To
HF363 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
HF2455 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
HF2455 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF657 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF657.html |