IA HF363 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing the use of a leashed dog to track and retrieve a wounded deer and providing a penalty. (See HF 657, HF 2455.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing the use of a leashed dog to track and retrieve a wounded deer and providing a penalty. (See HF 657, HF 2455.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 484. |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 420. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, M. Smith and Thorup. H.J. 362. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 264. |
Same As/Similar To
HF657 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
HF2455 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
HF2455 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF363 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF363.html |