IA HF2443 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the programs and duties of the economic development authority by making changes relative to the use of life cycle cost analyses, by making technical changes related to the high quality jobs program, by making changes relative to authority assistance for certain federal small business programs, by allowing counties, cities, and the authority to amend certain economic development enterprise zones agreements, and by making changes to the historic preservation and cultural and entertainment district tax credit, including transferring administrative oversight of the tax credit from the department of cultural affairs to the economic development authority, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2412) (Formerly HSB 612)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the programs and duties of the economic development authority by making changes relative to the use of life cycle cost analyses, by making technical changes related to the high quality jobs program, by making changes relative to authority assistance for certain federal small business programs, by allowing counties, cities, and the authority to amend certain economic development enterprise zones agreements, and by making changes to the historic preservation and cultural and entertainment district tax credit, including transferring administrative oversight of the tax credit from the department of cultural affairs to the economic development authority, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2412) (Formerly HSB 612)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 764. |
2016-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 721. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 1. H.J. 719. |
2016-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8256. H.J. 718. |
2016-04-20 | House | Senate amendment H-8256 filed. H.J. 702. |
2016-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 690. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 742. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 742. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal note, as amended by S-5146. SCS. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5146 adopted. S.J. 742. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5146 filed. S.J. 738. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 738. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Bolkcom, and Smith. S.J. 690. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 652. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 652. |
2016-04-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 603. |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 1. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8168 filed, adopted. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8160 withdrawn. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8153 as amended, adopted. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Ruled germane amendment H-8153, as amended. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8153, as amended, not germane. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8169 to amendment H-8153 adopted. H.J. 602. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8169 to amendment H-8153 filed. H.J. 601. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8151 withdrawn. H.J. 601. |
2016-04-05 | House | Amendment H-8160 filed. H.J. 597. |
2016-03-30 | House | Amendment H-8153 filed. H.J. 582. |
2016-03-29 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8151 filed. H.J. 569. |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 527. |